Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1041 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18844 Week
» 71860 Month
» 191387 Year
» 3218240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5925 |
on |
27/07/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
5539 |
on |
30/06/1934 |
British Railways |
45539 |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Patriot |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/07/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/09/1961 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,280,744 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/07/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5925, name: E.C. TRENCH Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
30/06/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5539 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45539 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45539 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|