31/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class '5' 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4761 (25/9), 4762 (2/10) and 4763 (9/10). Work has not yet started on the next 'Royal Scot' conversion (No. 6162), but the next two 'Patriot' rebuilds (Nos. 5540 and 5531) are receiving attention; the former will be completed by the end of October. Two further Class '7' 4-6-2's have had the streamline casing removed, viz.: Nos. 6228 (w/e 27/9) and 6245 (w/e 4/10), thus leaving only four streamlined 'Pacifics' on the L.M.S.: Nos. 6226, 6229, 6236 an 6243. The number of withdrawn locos. lying in the Works has been further reduced. The following engines have been cut up since 20/9: Nos. 6748 (w/e 12/10), 6650 (w/e 27/9), 6685 (w/e 27/9), 6704 (w/e 11/10), 6660 (w/e 4/10) and 25841 (w/e 4/10). The conversion of '8F' 2-8-0 No. 8653 to oil-burning was completed on 14/10 and No. 8606 will be similarly dealt with. 'Patriot' Class: No. 5518 now has the nameplates Bradshaw uncovered. 'Royal Scot' Class: No. 6144 has had its name restored after running without it continuously since well before the war. |
SLS/194711 |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
28/11/1959 |
Bushbury MPD |
To work the remaining Wolverhampton-B'ham-London trains (via Northampton) Royal Scots 46122/41/3/53/8 and Patriot 45540 have been allocated in place of the Jubilees (transferred to Carlisle). |
SLS/196001 |
07/01/1961 |
Trafford Park MPD |
70004/14/5/7/21/32/3/42 have been transferred to Willesden and replaced by 45540, 46106/22/37/41/3/53/8. On Saturday, 7th January, 70004 worked the 12-34 p.m. Watford-New St. Birmingham and returned on the 7-37 p.m. New St.-Euston. |
SLS/196102 |
03/06/1961 |
Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line |
With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). |
SLS/196107 |