Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 21 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4648 Week
» 6386 Month
» 133829 Year
» 1799205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5548 on 27/04/1934
British Railways 45548 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/04/1934 LYTHAM ST. ANNES

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Patriot
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Patriot27/04/1934
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/04/1934
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/06/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 20/09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/04/1934
5A   Crewe North on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24L   Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 23/01/1960
2A   Rugby w/e 23/04/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 31/12/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 2A Rugby 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1959 Mold Junction MPD Unrebuilt Patriots 45501/11/46/8 now work freights. SLS/196003
31/12/1960 Miscellaneous Nuneaton (2B) now has Patriots 45533/7/8/41/8. Jinty 47385 is at Arley Colliery and 47653 at Haunchwood. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/04/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5548, name: LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45548    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
09/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 45548    
20/09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev