31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
01/02/1948 |
Crewe Works |
Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were M4820 (North Shed), M6170, and M5101 in the Paint Shop. All three had cast plates bolted in front of the existing numberplate on th; smokebox door. New construction at the Works included: Nos. 4767 with Stephenson motion and M4748, first of the Caprotti's outside the Paint Shop. The Erecting Shop contained Nos. 6257 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4749 (complete), 4750 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4751 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted) and 4752 (frames and cylinders only), while out in the Yard were the frames and cylinders for 4753-56 inclusive, and 6154 (presumably next for rebuilding). The Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for the first of the next batch of 4-6-0's, presumably 4738 and also for 4757, as well as the frames only of 6105 |
SLS/194803 |
31/03/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month includes three more class '5' Caprotti 4-6-0's, Nos. 4750 , 4751 and 4752 completed on 17/2, 24/2 and 5/3 respectively, class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 6257 completed on 26/2, and 'Royal Scot' conversion No. 6154 completed on 27/2. It is understood that No. 6105 is the next 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt with a tapered boiler. No. 6257 bears the name City of Salford, and on 3/3 was noted in photographic livery on the weighbridge. It has all the latest modifications incorporated in No. 6256, and is No. 5 of order E 464. A Johnson '2F' 0-6-0 No. 3084 (Ex 2D) has been allocated to the C.M.E. Dept., Crewe, and is to be used on the daily trip between the Works and Basford Hall Sidings. Ex L. & N.W.R. engines continue to disappear steadily; among the latest batch of engines to go to the scrap heap were Service locomotives Nos. 3248/9 (the last 0-4-2ST Crane engines) and 0-4-0ST No. 3084. Scrapping dates from the middle of January are as follows:-W/E 17/1: Nos. 9206, 28343; w/e 24/1, 9374, 28546, 28550; w/e 31/1, 6674, 25791; w/e 7/2, 6754, 25775; w/e 14/2, 9182, 27648; w/e 21/2, 7715, 9175; w/e 28/2, 3084, 3249, 9251, 28117; w/e 6/3, 3248, 6729 an 28145 |
SLS/194804 |
31/03/1948 |
Crewe Works |
Two more Class '5' 4-6-0's of order E468 have been completed: No. 4753 on 12/3 and 4754 on 20/3. No. 4755, the first of three Caprotti engines to be fitted with a double chimney and electric lighting, is nearing completion and should be in traffic by the end of April. Owing to the irregular supply of roller bearing axleboxes, due no doubt to the shortage of material, the construction of Nos. 4756/7 is held up, and work has therefore started on the first two engines of order E469, Nos. 4738/9, the frames of which are in the Erecting Shop. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6154 , completed on 27/3, to be followed by Nos. 6105/37; the former is nearing completion and will probably be in traffic by the end of April. Several more ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut-up as follows:-Nos. 6636 W/E 27/3, 6682 W E 10/4; 6930 W/E 13/3, 7682 W/E 20/3, 27636 W/E 3/4 and 27664 W/E 3/4. The first engines to be re-numbered at Crewe (by the addition of 40000 to the existing number) were done during the W/E 3/4, the engines being Nos. 4754, 5069, 5292, 5411 an 5530 . The numerals on the cab sides are of the Gill Sans type, about nine inches in height. |
SLS/194805 |
31/05/1948 |
Locomotive Trials 1948 |
No. 60034 Lord Faringdon was the ex L.N.E.R. 'A4' 'Pacific' used in the trials on the Euston-Carlisle section, and on all four down trips was observed on time at Crewe. The two ex L.M.S. locomotives to be tested between Waterloo and Exeter are to be equipped with ex W.D. 5000 gallon tenders. Class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 46236 is to receive tender No. 79294 and Class '6P' 4-6-0 No. 46154 tender No. 79254. Both tenders are believed to have come from Swindon |
SLS/194807 |
31/12/1961 |
Millhouses closure |
Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). |
SLS/196203 |