Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 783 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14189 Week
» 67205 Month
» 186732 Year
» 3213585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6168 |
on |
20/10/1930 |
British Railways |
46168 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
7P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 02/05/1964 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/04/1946 |
Western Division (Crewe Works) |
Crewe Works: On 13/4, 6114 an 6168 were seen being rebuilt. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6168, name: THE GIRL GUIDE Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46168 |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46168 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|