|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 30/05/1934 | 12/06/1934 | 14 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 09/03/1935 | 09/05/1935 | 62 days | Heavy Service | Tender number 9065 (LMS 9t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 03/06/1935 | 07/06/1935 | 5 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 13/06/1935 | 21/06/1935 | 9 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 19/11/1935 | 24/01/1936 | 67 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 19/04/1936 | 14/05/1936 | 26 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 27/07/1936 | 30/07/1936 | 4 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 30/09/1936 | 12/10/1936 | 13 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 09/11/1936 | 23/11/1936 | 15 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 21/01/1937 | 10/02/1937 | 21 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 30/04/1937 | 10/06/1937 | 42 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 19/05/1938 | 23/06/1938 | 36 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 29/10/1938 | 21/11/1938 | 24 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 08/08/1939 | 09/09/1939 | 33 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 26/02/1940 | 20/03/1940 | 24 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 06/09/1940 | 24/09/1940 | 19 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 06/03/1941 | 02/04/1941 | 28 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 25/09/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 24 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 21/04/1942 | 23/06/1942 | 64 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 01/09/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 19 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 30/01/1943 | 02/03/1943 | 32 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 16/03/1943 | 01/04/1943 | 17 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 04/10/1943 | 04/11/1943 | 32 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 18/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 19/10/1944 | 17/11/1944 | 30 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 22/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 26/11/1945 | 01/01/1946 | 37 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 04/06/1946 | 29/07/1946 | 56 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 05/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 39 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 21/07/1947 | 16/09/1947 | 58 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 04/02/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 12/07/1948 | 14/08/1948 | 34 days | Heavy Service | Renumbered to BR 46200 |
||
Crewe Works | 18/02/1949 | 27/05/1949 | 99 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 28/07/1949 | 22/09/1949 | 57 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 27/12/1949 | 07/02/1950 | 43 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 31/05/1950 | 28/07/1950 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 15/03/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 66 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 21/11/1951 | 07/04/1952 | 139 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 04/11/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 26 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 17/01/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 120 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 29/04/1954 | 11/06/1954 | 44 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 17/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 20/07/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 9376 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 31/08/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 17 days | Non Classified | Rectification work |
||
Crewe Works | 25/09/1956 | 08/11/1956 | 45 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 29/01/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 09/11/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 7 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 09/03/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 90 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
Crewe Works | 22/09/1958 | 23/10/1958 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 06/11/1958 | 06/12/1958 | 31 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 29/04/1959 | 18/06/1959 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
St. Rollox Works | 10/09/1959 | 10/09/1959 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 14/12/1959 | 30/01/1960 | 48 days | Heavy General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1943 | Crewe Works | Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. | SLS/194401 |
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
20/06/1961 | LMSR Pacifics | 46200 an 46209 (5A) were both noted at Crewe on 20th June on passenger trains. | SLS/196107 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Kingmoor MPD (Stored) | In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. | SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 | Derby Works (Stored) | Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. | SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 | Birmingham Excursions (Stored) | On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1933 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6200 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
07/1933 | Naming | Named 'THE PRINCESS ROYAL' | ||
30/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 30/05/1934. Dep: 12/06/1934. | ||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 09/05/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 9065 (LMS 9t Riveted) attached. |
||
03/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 03/06/1935. Dep: 07/06/1935. | ||
13/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 13/06/1935. Dep: 21/06/1935. | ||
19/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 19/11/1935. Dep: 24/01/1936. | ||
19/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 19/04/1936. Dep: 14/05/1936. | ||
27/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 27/07/1936. Dep: 30/07/1936. | ||
30/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 30/09/1936. Dep: 12/10/1936. | ||
09/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 09/11/1936. Dep: 23/11/1936. | ||
25/11/1936 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 10t Riveted number 9372 | ||
21/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 21/01/1937. Dep: 10/02/1937. | ||
30/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/04/1937. Dep: 10/06/1937. | ||
19/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 19/05/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938. | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 21/11/1938. | ||
08/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/08/1939. Dep: 09/09/1939. | ||
26/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/02/1940. Dep: 20/03/1940. | ||
06/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 06/09/1940. Dep: 24/09/1940. | ||
06/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 06/03/1941. Dep: 02/04/1941. | ||
25/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 25/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. | ||
06/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
21/04/1942 | Allocation | Loaned to Camden (1B) | ||
21/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 23/06/1942. | ||
16/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. | ||
17/10/1942 | Allocation | Loaned to Camden (1B) | ||
30/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 30/01/1943. Dep: 02/03/1943. | ||
16/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 16/03/1943. Dep: 01/04/1943. | ||
03/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
22/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 04/10/1943. Dep: 04/11/1943. | ||
18/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
20/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
19/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/10/1944. Dep: 17/11/1944. | ||
22/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 22/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
26/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 26/11/1945. Dep: 01/01/1946. | ||
04/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 04/06/1946. Dep: 29/07/1946. | ||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
21/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/07/1947. Dep: 16/09/1947. | ||
18/10/1947 | Allocation | Loaned to Crewe North (5A) | ||
17/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
04/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 04/02/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 12/07/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 46200 |
||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
18/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 27/05/1949. | ||
28/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 22/09/1949. | ||
27/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 27/12/1949. Dep: 07/02/1950. | ||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 28/07/1950. | ||
15/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/03/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951. | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to Polmadie (66A) | ||
21/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 07/04/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. | ||
17/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
23/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
29/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1954. Dep: 11/06/1954. | ||
12/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
26/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
17/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. | ||
18/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
25/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
20/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/07/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 9376 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955. Work undertaken: Rectification work |
||
20/06/1956 | Tender | Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted number 9066 | ||
15/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
25/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/09/1956. Dep: 08/11/1956. | ||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. | ||
22/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. | ||
30/11/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
09/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. Work undertaken: Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
05/1958 | Livery | Change of livery to Standard BR red for steam locomotives | ||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958. | ||
06/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1958. Dep: 06/12/1958. | ||
29/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959. | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/07/1959 | Modification | Modification: Speedometer fitted | ||
10/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 10/09/1959. | ||
14/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/12/1959. Dep: 30/01/1960. | ||
02/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
27/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
07/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46200 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Connels: Coatbridge |