Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 12 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2087 Week
» 27448 Month
» 260368 Year
» 1925744 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Original) 2179 m/e 03/1908
Great Western Railway 4518 on 28/12/1912

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 45xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal Wed 01/10/1952
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1908
MCH   Machynlleth m/e 30/06/1948
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 31/12/1949
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 20/05/1950
83D   Laira 4w/e 15/07/1950
     Withdrawn on 01/10/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MCH Machynlleth m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 15/07/1950
WDN   m/e 31/10/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2179
Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
   
28/12/1912 Renumbered Renumbered to 4518    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH)    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
01/10/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 4518    

prev prev