Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 959 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2033 Week
» 27394 Month
» 260314 Year
» 1925690 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4614 on 27/02/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Fri 27/02/1942
Withdrawal Fri 24/07/1964
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/02/1942
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
WOS   Worcester 4w/e 23/04/1949
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 26/12/1953
85A   Worcester 4w/e 05/11/1955
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 28/01/1956
85A   Worcester 4w/e 14/07/1956
85C   Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 12/08/1961
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 14/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 24/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/02/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4614
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
23/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
24/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4614    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev