Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 815 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6215 Week
» 24267 Month
» 257187 Year
» 1922563 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4616 on 23/04/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Mon 23/04/1942
Withdrawal Mon 19/10/1964
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/04/1942
CED   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/03/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88A   Radyr 4w/e 12/06/1958
88C   Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
73H   Dover Marine w/e 11/03/1959
70D   Basingstoke 2w/e 10/10/1961
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 28/05/1962
70E   Salisbury 4w/e 01/04/1963
72A   Exmouth Junction on 08/09/1963
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 22/02/1964
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 73H Dover Marine 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 28/05/1962
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 3w/e 01/04/1963
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 24/02/1964
WDN   w/e 19/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/01/1959 Western Region panniers The batch of 34XX panniers ex-store at Barry are now at Radyr except 3400(84G), and 3405/6 88C. They have replaced 4601/10/6/26/30/4/72/86 which have been modified for work on the S.R. and are now re-allocated to Dover and Folkestone. SLS/195903
26/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/04/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4616
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
19/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4616    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev