Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 7 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2082 Week
» 27443 Month
» 260363 Year
» 1925739 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4625 on 15/09/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Mon 15/09/1942
Withdrawal Mon 21/05/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/09/1942
85A   Worcester 4w/e 22/03/1952
85A   Worcester 4w/e 30/04/1952
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 12/06/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 09/08/1958
84B   Oxley 4w/e 15/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 21/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 15/07/1961
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4625
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
21/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4625    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev