Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 320 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4297 Week
» 15534 Month
» 248454 Year
» 1913830 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4629 on 06/10/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Tue 06/10/1942
Withdrawal Tue 10/09/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/10/1942
KDR   Kidderminster 8w/e 23/03/1946
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1959
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/10/1963 Swindon Works (Dump) Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4629
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
10/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4629    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev