Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 705 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6105 Week
» 24157 Month
» 257077 Year
» 1922453 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4630 on 09/11/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Tue 09/11/1942
Withdrawal Tue 26/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/11/1942
AYN   Abercynon 4w/e 08/10/1949
CED   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 21/04/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 19/05/1951
73H   Dover Marine w/e 11/03/1959
72B   Salisbury m/e 09/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 26/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AYN Abercynon 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 21/04/1951
LOAN 73H Dover Marine 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/01/1964
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 24/02/1964
WDN   7w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709
24/01/1959 Western Region panniers The batch of 34XX panniers ex-store at Barry are now at Radyr except 3400(84G), and 3405/6 88C. They have replaced 4601/10/6/26/30/4/72/86 which have been modified for work on the S.R. and are now re-allocated to Dover and Folkestone. SLS/195903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/11/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4630
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (AYN)    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
26/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4630    
02/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev