Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 804 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6204 Week
» 24256 Month
» 257176 Year
» 1922552 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4632 on 17/11/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Mon 17/11/1942
Withdrawal Mon 08/01/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/11/1942
88C   Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 18/04/1959
     Withdrawn on 08/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   m/e 31/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/03/1962 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/11/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4632
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4632    
05/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev