Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 723 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6123 Week
» 24175 Month
» 257095 Year
» 1922471 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4635 on 14/12/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 336
To Service Sat 14/12/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/07/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/12/1942
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
2A   Tyseley on 17/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 16/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/04/1961 Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4635
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
16/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 4635    
11/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev