Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3421 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16827 Week
» 69843 Month
» 189370 Year
» 3216223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4640 |
on |
31/12/1942 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
336 |
To Service |
Mon 31/12/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/12/1963 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
31/12/1942 |
DYD |
|
Duffryn Yard |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/12/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4640 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
16/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4640 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|