Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 4 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2079 Week
» 27440 Month
» 260360 Year
» 1925736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4641 on 31/12/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 336
To Service Mon 31/12/1942
Withdrawal Mon 21/05/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 31/12/1942
WOS   Worcester 4w/e 24/01/1948
KDR   Kidderminster m/e 31/03/1948
WOS   Worcester m/e 30/06/1948
85C   Hereford 4w/e 21/04/1951
85C   Hereford 3w/e 19/05/1951
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 21/03/1953
85A   Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1960
84G   Kidderminster 4w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC WOS Worcester m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 85D Bromsgrove 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4641
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
31/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
21/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4641    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev