Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 793 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6193 Week
» 24245 Month
» 257165 Year
» 1922541 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4675 on 21/03/1944

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 352
To Service Thu 21/03/1944
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/03/1944
88C   Barry 3w/e 04/05/1964
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 12/10/1964
87F   Llanelly w/e 08/11/1964
     Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1944 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4675
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4675    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev