Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 775 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6175 Week
» 24227 Month
» 257147 Year
» 1922523 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4684 on 02/12/1944

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 352
To Service Wed 02/12/1944
Withdrawal Wed 21/07/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/12/1944
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952
87B   Duffryn Yard 2w/e 12/07/1952
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 29/01/1955
87B   Duffryn Yard 8w/e 26/03/1955
88H   Tondu 4w/e 06/04/1963
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
     Withdrawn on 21/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/12/1944 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4684
Built at Swindon Works
   
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
21/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4684    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev