Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 805 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6205 Week
» 24257 Month
» 257177 Year
» 1922553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4690 on 08/01/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 352
To Service Wed 08/01/1945
Withdrawal Wed 09/10/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/01/1945
88C   Barry 4w/e 22/04/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 02/12/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 09/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 02/12/1950
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/10/1961 Caerphilly Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. SLS/196112
27/10/1963 Swindon Works (Triangle) Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. SLS/196312
15/12/1963 Swindon Works (Yard) Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/01/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4690
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
09/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4690    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev