Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 910 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18713 Week
» 71729 Month
» 191256 Year
» 3218109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4802 |
m/e |
08/1932 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1402 |
on |
02/11/1946 (at Gloucester) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
During 08/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/10/1956 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
Total Mileage |
792,802 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4802 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
02/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1402 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cheltenham Malvern Road (CHEL) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1402 |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|