Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 861 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18664 Week
» 71680 Month
» 191207 Year
» 3218060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4803 |
m/e |
09/1932 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1403 |
on |
26/10/1946 (at Weymouth) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
During 09/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/11/1957 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
716,813 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4803 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1403 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
05/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1403 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|