Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 20 Today
» 4309 Yesterday
» 22132 Week
» 75148 Month
» 194675 Year
» 3221528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4817 |
on |
21/04/1933 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1417 |
on |
26/10/1946 (at Oswestry) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Mon 21/04/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/02/1959 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/04/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4817 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
18/05/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1417 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) |
|
|
16/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1417 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|