Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4288 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17694 Week
» 70710 Month
» 190237 Year
» 3217090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4821 |
on |
07/11/1933 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1421 |
on |
02/11/1946 (at Ebbw Junction) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Sat 07/11/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Total Mileage |
662,322 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/02/1952 |
Penygraig Branch |
Although its future as a passenger line appears a little doubtful the branch has a more useful passenger service than the corresponding time in 1951 when fuel cuts reduced the service to morning and evenings only. The goods traffic has probably increased since last year, as the traffic which then passed down the Pwllyrhebog incline now comes down the Penygraig branch. On a trip over the branch, behind either 1421 o 1472, it is nothing unusual to see up to half a dozen panniers in sidings or loops, although, of the once numerous collieries in the Ely Valley, only one, at Coed Ely, is now working. These panniers, and the two 0-4-2 Tanks, are allocated to Llantrisant shed. In addition to the Ely Valley line the duties of the panniers include the daily goods to Cowbridge and back and the short trip to Llanharry Quarries and back. The 0-4-2 Tanks also work the autos to Pontypridd. The service has also been curtailed since the fuel crisis and, except on Saturdays, is morning and evening only. There would appear to be a certain amount of residential traffic between Beddau, Church Village, Llantwit, and Pontypridd. |
SLS/195204 |
07/03/1961 |
Marlow MPD |
This shed was scheduled for closing from beginning of 1961 but except on Sunday nights is still regularly used by the branch engine. At the beginning of March, the coaling platform was rebuilt. The engine returns to Slough on Sunday nights but resumes work on the branch on Monday mornings except when changed over; 1421 an 1453 have appeared. |
SLS/196104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4821 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
20/04/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
02/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1421 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1421 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|