Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1793 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25424 Week
» 90378 Month
» 293042 Year
» 3319895 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4845 |
on |
16/04/1935 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1445 |
on |
25/11/1946 (at Hereford) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
288 |
To Service |
Tue 16/04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/09/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/02/1964 |
Worcester Works |
1445 (85C), 4992 (82B), 6846 (82E), 7926 (85A), 8405 (85D), 73003 (82E). |
SLS/196403 |
23/02/1964 |
Southern Withdrawals |
With the exception of 33007, these engines (33007, 31833, 35002/15) are to remain at depots and not to be moved or used until notice for movement is given. |
SLS/196403 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4845 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
25/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1445 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
01/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1445 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|