Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 377 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18180 Week
» 71196 Month
» 190723 Year
» 3217576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4863 |
on |
15/02/1936 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1463 |
on |
09/11/1946 (at Bristol Bath Road) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
287 |
To Service |
Thu 15/02/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 27/04/1961 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4863 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
09/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1463 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
27/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1463 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|