Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3420 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16826 Week
» 69842 Month
» 189369 Year
» 3216222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4866 |
on |
21/02/1936 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1466 |
on |
07/11/1946 (at Newton Abbot) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
287 |
To Service |
Sat 21/02/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Total Mileage |
728,230 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
4w/e |
03/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
83C |
Exeter |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
ALLOC |
83B |
Taunton |
5w/e |
02/11/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Closure proposals |
Proposals have been submitted to the T.U.C.C. to withdraw passenger services on the Hemyock and Porthcawl branches and as the present policy of the W.R. is not to run excursion trains over closed lines, this will be applied to the Porthcawl branch. (On 12th May, the Tiverton-Hemyock service was being run by 1434 whilst 1466 was working the auto trains between Tiverton Junc. and Tiverton). The Brixham and Merthyr-Hirwain branches have been submitted for complete closure. It is also proposed to withdraw local services between Banbury and Princes Risboro' leaving only Bicester North open in the section for main line trains to call at. In connection with proposals re the Neath and Brecon line, although passenger services will be withdrawn, it is proposed to retain Neath Riverside to deal with school trains from the Vale of Neath line. In connection with the withdrawal of passenger services between Treherbert and Neath, it is proposed also to close completely the section between Briton Ferry and Burrow Junc. (Aberavon). In connection with proposals before the T.U.C.C. re the Taunton-Chard branch it is now promised to close completely the section between Creech Junc. and Chard, leaving latter to be served for goods traffic from Chard Junc., S.R. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4866 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
07/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1466 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1466 |
|
|