Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4874 |
on |
23/04/1936 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1474 |
on |
09/11/1946 (at Oswestry) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
287 |
To Service |
Mon 23/04/1936 to Brecon (BCN) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/09/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4874 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
09/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1474 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
28/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1474 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|