Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 992 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2066 Week
» 27427 Month
» 260347 Year
» 1925723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4987 m/e 01/1931

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1931 BROCKLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 268
To Service During 01/1931
Withdrawal Mon 09/04/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1931
84K   Chester West 4w/e 25/02/1950
84D   Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1951
84D   Leamington m/e 31/07/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/12/1955
81F   Oxford 4w/e 12/06/1958
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1958
81C   Southall 4w/e 07/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 09/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
15/12/1963 Swindon Works (Yard) Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4987, name: BROCKLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
31/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
09/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4987    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev