Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 213 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3245 Week
» 21297 Month
» 254217 Year
» 1919593 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 50176 11/02/1957

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 101
Vehicle Type Motor Composite (with Lavatory) (MC(L))
To Service 11/02/1957
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn
51A Darlington (New) on 11/02/1957


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
15/06/1973 (snapshot)   50194 (MC(L)),  59088 (TS(L)),  59093 (TBS(L)),  50176 (MC(L))
06/07/1973 (snapshot)   50176 (MC(L)),  59093 (TBS(L)),  59088 (TS(L)),  50194 (MC(L))
01/02/1981 (snapshot) 318 51244 (MBS),  59061 (TS(L)),  50176 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev