Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 830 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6757 Week
» 5495 Month
» 419816 Year
» 1641381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5021 on 17/08/1932

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/08/1932 WHITTINGTON CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 280
To Service Fri 17/08/1932 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Cardiff Canton (88A)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2613 17/08/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 27/11/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 02/01/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2574 09/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2536 02/09/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2733 23/08/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2531 10/11/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2640 08/12/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2531 25/05/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2773 22/11/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2793 18/05/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 16/06/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 08/09/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2651 19/09/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2443 15/05/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2878 29/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4057 03/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4055 01/11/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2704 06/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2548 18/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4042 04/10/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2886 17/08/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4018 05/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 22/06/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2828 28/12/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2731 22/08/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2727 22/03/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4120 17/12/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4030 15/09/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) on 17/08/1932
SDN Swindon on 10/03/1933
LA Laira m/e 31/03/1933
NA Newton Abbot on 09/01/1935
LA Laira on 01/02/1935
NA Newton Abbot on 17/03/1936
LA Laira on 29/08/1937
4A Shrewsbury on 17/12/1938
SRD Stafford Road on 25/11/1940
4A Shrewsbury on 05/04/1941
SRD Stafford Road on 20/05/1942
4A Shrewsbury on 08/09/1945
LA Laira on 29/06/1948
83C Exeter m/e 10/1952
83D Laira m/e 03/1957
86C Cardiff Canton on 22/09/1959
82B St Philips Marsh on 15/09/1960
88A Cardiff Canton on 03/10/1960
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 05/10/1960
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/08/1932 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6608)
09/03/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6602)
08/12/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4619)
16/06/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4644)
08/09/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6629)
29/06/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6656)
03/05/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6618)
01/11/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6641)
22/06/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)
28/12/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6626)
17/12/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
19/09/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6695)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 22/02/1933 10/03/1933 17 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 04/10/1933 11/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 06/11/1934 09/01/1935 65 days Intermediate
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
149691
Swindon Works 02/09/1935 19/09/1935 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/01/1936 17/03/1936 58 days General
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
224695
Swindon Works 21/08/1936 02/09/1936 13 days Light Repair
Damage incurred in an accident on 21st August 1936.
Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/06/1937 29/08/1937 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2733 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
306
Swindon Works 29/10/1938 17/12/1938 50 days General
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2531 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
395803
Swindon Works 03/10/1940 25/11/1940 54 days Intermediate
Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
475930
Swindon Works 21/03/1942 20/05/1942 61 days Light Repair
Tender number 2793 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/05/1943 20/06/1943 48 days General
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
581296
Swindon Works 27/07/1945 08/09/1945 44 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
670645
Swindon Works 08/08/1946 19/09/1946 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2651 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/05/1948 29/06/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 6656 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2878 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
771548
Swindon Works 20/03/1950 03/05/1950 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
851815
Swindon Works 27/09/1951 01/11/1951 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
932707
Swindon Works 19/08/1952 18/09/1952 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/06/1953 17/08/1953 60 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2886 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1022670
Swindon Works 26/01/1954 05/03/1954 39 days Light Casual
Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/05/1955 22/06/1955 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1103020
Swindon Works 17/10/1956 28/12/1956 73 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2828 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1155030
Swindon Works 15/06/1957 22/08/1957 69 days Light Casual
Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/10/1958 17/12/1958 69 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1266302
Swindon Works 27/06/1960 15/09/1960 81 days Heavy General
Tender number 4030 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. SLS/194807
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2613    
17/08/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5021, name: WHITTINGTON CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
10/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
31/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
27/11/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2601    
09/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
01/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
17/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
29/08/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
17/12/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
25/05/1940 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2531    
25/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
05/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
20/05/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
08/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
15/05/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2443    
29/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
04/10/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4042    
03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
22/03/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2727    
22/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
15/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
19/09/1961 Modification Diagram HC number 6695 boiler fitted    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5021 from Cardiff Canton (88A)    

prev prev