Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2395 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15801 Week
» 68817 Month
» 188344 Year
» 3215197 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5049 |
04/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24049 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
04/04/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1976 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
04/04/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
03/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1972 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5049 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24049 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24049 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|