|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 02/11/1937 | 19/12/1937 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
113919 | |
Swindon Works | 14/06/1939 | 1 day | Intermediate | ||||
Swindon Works | 22/10/1940 | 27/11/1940 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 08/01/1942 | 06/03/1942 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
348157 | |
Swindon Works | 06/04/1942 | 17/04/1942 | 12 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/04/1943 | 03/06/1943 | 50 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 27/09/1943 | 22/10/1943 | 26 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 10/07/1944 | 23/08/1944 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
457512 | |
Swindon Works | 06/09/1945 | 22/10/1945 | 47 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2692 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/08/1946 | 12/09/1946 | 32 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
569356 | |
Swindon Works | 14/10/1947 | 17/11/1947 | 35 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2810 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
638327 | |
Swindon Works | 17/06/1949 | 04/08/1949 | 49 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
731575 | |
Swindon Works | 12/02/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2910 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
814970 | |
Swindon Works | 08/01/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) |
922121 | |
Swindon Works | 11/02/1954 | 12/03/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/10/1954 | 17/11/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4090 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1017764 | |
Swindon Works | 06/12/1956 | 15/01/1957 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1118200 | |
Swindon Works | 25/06/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 80 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2752 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1206422 | |
Swindon Works | 25/06/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1312887 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. | SLS/194712 |
30/06/1949 | Swindon Works (entering Works) | New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. | SLS/194908 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/05/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5052, name: EASTNOR CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL OF RADNOR' | ||
02/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1937. Dep: 19/12/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1939. | ||
10/08/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2636 | ||
22/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1940. Dep: 27/11/1940. | ||
08/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1942. Dep: 06/03/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1942. Dep: 17/04/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 03/06/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 22/10/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1944. Dep: 23/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 22/10/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2692 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/08/1946. Dep: 12/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
14/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/10/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2810 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/06/1949. Dep: 04/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/07/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2546 | ||
12/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2910 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/09/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2771 | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) |
||
27/09/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2403 | ||
30/01/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4018 | ||
11/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 12/03/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1954. Dep: 17/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4090 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/11/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2624 | ||
06/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/12/1956. Dep: 15/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2752 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
16/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport | ||
21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5052 from St Philips Marsh (82B) |