|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 08/09/1937 | 25/10/1937 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/04/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2608 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
123967 | |
Swindon Works | 08/12/1939 | 10/02/1940 | 65 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
217791 | |
Swindon Works | 26/07/1940 | 08/08/1940 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 05/12/1940 | 11/02/1941 | 69 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
264918 | |
Swindon Works | 22/04/1942 | 14/06/1942 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
341568 | |
Swindon Works | 28/04/1943 | 22/06/1943 | 56 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
396633 | |
Swindon Works | 05/01/1944 | 02/02/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2828 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/12/1944 | 19/01/1945 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
475150 | |
Swindon Works | 26/02/1946 | 04/04/1946 | 38 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/07/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 54 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/02/1947 | 20/03/1947 | 41 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2811 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
550718 | |
Swindon Works | 25/02/1948 | 01/04/1948 | 37 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
603125 | |
Swindon Works | 30/06/1949 | 16/08/1949 | 48 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
668930 | |
Swindon Works | 11/04/1951 | 10/05/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
751097 | |
Swindon Works | 31/10/1952 | 11/12/1952 | 42 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
839114 | |
Swindon Works | 01/11/1954 | 08/12/1954 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6680 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
933227 | |
Swindon Works | 10/09/1956 | 24/10/1956 | 45 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1032324 | |
Swindon Works | 13/06/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 84 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4123 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1123646 | |
Swindon Works | 11/08/1960 | 10/10/1960 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4092 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1219660 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. | SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 | Stock Returns | No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. | SLS/194605 |
29/02/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender | SLS/194804 |
30/06/1949 | Swindon Works (entering Works) | New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. | SLS/194908 |
10/09/1961 | Britannia class 7s | The remaining 12 B.R. Britannias on the W.R. (70016/8/9/20/2-9) (from 88A, Cardiff Canton) were transferred to the L.M.R. on 10th September. In the small hours of that morning 6 went light-engine to Shrewsbury, one worked a freight to Shrewsbury and another the 7-10 a.m. to London. Two more (70019/26) were at that time stopped at Worcester and Swindon and will presumably go direct from there. 70023/4 were retained in service against non-arrival of replacements and finally worked the 8-55 a.m. passenger and 12-55 a.m. freight to Shrewsbury respectively on 13th September. In replacement, Canton has been allocated 4083, 5020/53/73/91/6, 6010/24 an 7016 together with seven Halls. The two Kings are to strengthen the power on the Shrewsbury road. There are indications that this is only a part of re-arrangements involving redistribution of steam power from the west of England as 5058 (ex Laira) was observed in transit to Gloucester the same weekend. 70025/7/8 subsequently arrived at Bescot and are working goods and mineral trains. 70026 arrived at Aston. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1907 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2384 | ||
29/05/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5053, name: BISHOP'S CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (4A) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
30/08/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL CAIRNS' | ||
08/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1937. Dep: 25/10/1937. | ||
25/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
28/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/04/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2608 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/12/1939. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1940. Dep: 08/08/1940. | ||
05/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1940. Dep: 11/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2399 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1942. Dep: 14/06/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 22/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1944. Dep: 02/02/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2828 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1944. Dep: 19/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/12/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2430 | ||
26/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1946. Dep: 04/04/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/05/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2673 | ||
16/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 20/03/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2811 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
25/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1948. Dep: 01/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/05/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2857 | ||
30/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/06/1949. Dep: 16/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/05/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2553 | ||
11/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/04/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/05/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2724 | ||
31/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 11/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/03/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2754 | ||
01/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 08/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6680 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4123 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
11/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1960. Dep: 10/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4092 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) | ||
13/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5053 from Cardiff Canton (88A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |