|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 22/03/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 60 days | Intermediate | 119474 | ||
Swindon Works | 16/07/1941 | 21/09/1941 | 68 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
211750 | |
Swindon Works | 10/01/1943 | 03/03/1943 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
281072 | |
Swindon Works | 09/03/1944 | 23/04/1944 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 13/03/1945 | 27/04/1945 | 46 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
376209 | |
Swindon Works | 30/09/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
465055 | |
Swindon Works | 07/01/1949 | 24/01/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4017 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/09/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
536452 | |
Swindon Works | 03/06/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 32 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
619317 | |
Swindon Works | 14/05/1954 | 23/06/1954 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7653 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
699788 | |
Swindon Works | 04/04/1956 | 23/10/1956 | 203 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
776687 | |
Swindon Works | 10/06/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 88 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7677 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2625 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
859003 | |
Swindon Works | 15/11/1960 | 04/01/1961 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. | SLS/194712 |
31/01/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/1937 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5061, name: SUDELEY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (4A) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
27/10/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL OF BIRKENHEAD' | ||
10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
16/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/07/1941. Dep: 21/09/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2582 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
22/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
09/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1944. Dep: 23/04/1944. | ||
13/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 27/04/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) | ||
30/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 24/01/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 4017 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/03/1950 | To Store | To Store at Swindon (82C) | ||
11/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
14/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/05/1954. Dep: 23/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7653 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 23/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7677 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2625 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
09/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
15/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 04/01/1961. | ||
21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5061 from Cardiff Canton (88A) | ||
21/09/1962 | Modification | Diagram HD number 7654 boiler fitted | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |