|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 17/04/1941 | 01/07/1941 | 76 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
113455 | |
Swindon Works | 27/09/1943 | 14/11/1943 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2678 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
224079 | |
Swindon Works | 21/02/1946 | 22/03/1946 | 30 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2644 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
319679 | |
Swindon Works | 13/11/1947 | 22/12/1947 | 40 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
386032 | |
Swindon Works | 27/10/1949 | 30/11/1949 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
464696 | |
Swindon Works | 11/01/1950 | 17/01/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 21/06/1950 | 27/07/1950 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 17/10/1951 | 16/11/1951 | 31 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
545834 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1952 | 29/10/1952 | 35 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/04/1953 | 22/05/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/02/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
646880 | |
Swindon Works | 29/11/1955 | 05/01/1956 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
738439 | |
Swindon Works | 04/12/1957 | 24/01/1958 | 52 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
848760 | |
Swindon Works | 04/03/1960 | 24/05/1960 | 82 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7607 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
950732 | |
Swindon Works | 04/02/1961 | 12/04/1961 | 68 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 10/08/1961 | 11/12/1961 | 124 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 7689 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1003451 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. | SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 | Stock Returns | No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. | SLS/194605 |
30/11/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. | SLS/194801 |
17/09/1961 | Swindon Works (Works Sidings) | 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. | SLS/196111 |
12/11/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. | SLS/196201 |
17/03/1963 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. | SLS/196304 |
24/04/1963 | Derby MPD (Works Yard) | 42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1939 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5078, name: LAMPHEY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (LA) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
01/1941 | Naming | Renamed 'BEAUFORT' | ||
17/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1941. Dep: 01/07/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2739 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (TN) | ||
01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
27/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 14/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2678 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/02/1946. Dep: 22/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2644 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
13/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1947. Dep: 22/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/10/1949. Dep: 30/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 17/01/1950. | ||
21/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1950. Dep: 27/07/1950. | ||
17/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/10/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 22/05/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 05/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/12/1957. Dep: 24/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
02/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
04/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1960. Dep: 24/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7607 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2402 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
03/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
28/01/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2788 | ||
04/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 12/04/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
10/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 11/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7689 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
11/12/1961 | To Store | To Store at Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
20/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5078 from Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |