Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 507 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7190 Week
» 18236 Month
» 18236 Year
» 1683612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5079 on 11/05/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/05/1939 LYDFORD CASTLE
11/1940 LYSANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 310
To Service Fri 11/05/1939 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Fri 06/05/1960 off Landore (87E)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2781 11/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2440 01/11/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2725 23/08/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2766 07/01/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2579 06/03/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 01/09/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g Oil 2827 24/01/1947 GWR 4,000g
Collett 4,000g 2734 07/10/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2798 03/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 26/08/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2720 16/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2747 27/08/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4085 26/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2778 16/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2871 20/01/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 11/05/1939
CDF Cardiff Canton on 13/11/1940
LDR Landore m/e 03/1941
SDN Swindon on 24/01/1947
LA Laira m/e 03/1947
NA Newton Abbot m/e 11/1947
87E Landore on 22/04/1960
   Withdrawn on 06/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 01/11/1947
WDN   on 06/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/05/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted
01/09/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4646)
24/01/1947 Converted to oil burnng
24/01/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)
07/10/1948 Oil burning equipment removed
07/10/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
22/06/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7637)
26/05/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7604)
16/03/1956 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7607)
20/01/1958 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7612)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 03/07/1939 05/07/1939 3 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 24/09/1940 13/11/1940 51 days Light Repair
Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Named LYSANDER
 
Swindon Works 27/06/1941 27/08/1941 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
121930
Swindon Works 28/11/1943 14/01/1944 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2766 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
239063
Swindon Works 23/02/1944 08/03/1944 15 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/07/1945 01/09/1945 47 days General
Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
314868
Swindon Works 09/12/1946 24/01/1947 47 days Intermediate
Oil burning equipment fitted
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached.
Converted to oil burnng
380626
Swindon Works 07/09/1948 07/10/1948 31 days Intermediate
Oil burning equipment removed
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Oil burning equipment removed
445500
Swindon Works 16/05/1950 22/06/1950 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7637 (Diagram HC)
523681
Swindon Works 25/02/1952 03/04/1952 39 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2798 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
618575
Swindon Works 23/07/1952 26/08/1952 35 days Light Casual
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/03/1953 16/04/1953 32 days Light Casual
Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/06/1953 27/08/1953 59 days Light Casual
Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 14/04/1954 26/05/1954 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7604 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4085 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
714026
Swindon Works 23/01/1956 16/03/1956 54 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7607 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
797270
Swindon Works 14/12/1957 20/01/1958 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7612 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2871 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
897679

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) SLS/194702
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/05/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5079, name: LYDFORD CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
13/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
24/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
22/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
06/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5079 from Landore (87E)    

prev prev