Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 586 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5305 Week
» 16450 Month
» 116235 Year
» 1781611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 51505 13/02/1959

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 102
Vehicle Type Motor Composite (with Lavatory) (MC(L))
To Service 13/02/1959
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn
53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) on 13/02/1959
BR Bristol Bath Road on 20/09/1987


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
06/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))
13/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))
12/1982 (snapshot) C823 51505 (MC(L)),  59082 (TBS(L)),  51511 (MC(L))
14/10/1989 (snapshot) CH615 50534 (MBS),  51505 (MC(L))
11/1992 (snapshot) 101682 51505 (MC(L)),  50256 (MBS)
11/1993 (snapshot) 101682 51505 (MC(L)),  50256 (MBS)

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev