Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 629 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 16493 Month
» 116278 Year
» 1781654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 51511 15/04/1959

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 102
Vehicle Type Motor Composite (with Lavatory) (MC(L))
To Service 15/04/1959
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn
SGosfo (New) on 15/04/1959
BR Bristol Bath Road on 20/09/1987


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
29/06/1973 (snapshot)   51511 (MC(L)),  59043 (TS(L)),  59050 (TBS(L)),  50147 (MC(L))
12/1982 (snapshot) C823 51505 (MC(L)),  59082 (TBS(L)),  51511 (MC(L))
14/10/1989 (snapshot) CH643 51511 (MC(L)),  51462 (MBS)
11/1992 (snapshot) 101690 51184 (MBS),  51511 (MC(L))
11/1993 (snapshot) 101689 51185 (MBS),  51511 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev