Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 799 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6199 Week
» 24251 Month
» 257171 Year
» 1922547 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5153 m/e 03/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 257
To Service During 03/1930
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/11/1964
Service Life 34 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1930
81B   Slough 4w/e 21/02/1959
83A   Newton Abbot 4w/e 21/03/1959
84G   Kidderminster 4w/e 08/09/1962
2L   Leamington w/e 15/08/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 21/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 2L Leamington 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 21/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. SLS/194606
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811
31/12/1948 Swindon Works (Stock Shed) New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906
26/05/1949 Swindon Stock Shed On 26/5, the Stock Shed contained (all stored):-Nos. 2948, 4121/24 (ex Wolverhampton Works), 4168/69, 4914, 5153, 5162 (ex Wolverhampton Works), 5411/17, 5919, 6997-99, 7209, 7900/02/3/4. SLS/194907
10/08/1949 Swindon Stock Shed The Stock Shed contained Nos. 1025, 2462, 2948, 4121/68/69, 5153/62, 5411/17, 5563, 5761, 6129/66, 7209. Amongst various engines 'on shed' were Nos. 1503, (marked PDN), 2568 (ex Works), 3820 (ex 4856-oil-burning), 9008/11. SLS/194909
11/08/1949 Swindon Stock Shed Stock Shed: The following were noted stored here on 11/8:-Nos. 2948, 4121/68/69, 5153/62, 5411/17, 6129/66 an 7209. Nos. 3015/18 are now ex store and have gone into traffic. SLS/194910
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5153
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (84G)    
15/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
21/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5153    
06/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev