Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 959 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2033 Week
» 27394 Month
» 260314 Year
» 1925690 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5177 m/e 01/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 259
To Service During 01/1931
Withdrawal Tue 30/05/1961
Service Life 30 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1931
84K   Chester West 4w/e 29/11/1952
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/08/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 26/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 30/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   m/e 31/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901
23/07/1968 Swindon Works (Works Yard) 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5177
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
30/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5177    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev