Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4188 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17594 Week
» 70610 Month
» 190137 Year
» 3216990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5178 |
08/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25028 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
cX |
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/02/1963 |
Power Unit VA691 |
|
|
|
08/02/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21050 |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
27/05/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5178 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25028 |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25028 from Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|