Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1982 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15388 Week
» 68404 Month
» 187931 Year
» 3214784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5178 |
m/e |
01/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 01/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/03/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5178 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellington (WLN) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
14/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5178 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|