Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 51802 27/10/1959

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 102
Vehicle Type Motor Composite (with Lavatory) (MC(L))
To Service 27/10/1959
Withdrawn 19/06/1988 off Tyseley (TS)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64H Leith Central (New) on 27/10/1959
TS Tyseley on 08/05/1988
   Withdrawn on 19/06/1988


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
01/02/1981 (snapshot) 331 51457 (MBS),  59689 (TC(L)),  51802 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev