Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5181 |
04/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25031 |
01/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/12/1970 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS, EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
04/03/1963 |
Power Unit VA700 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5181 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
01/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25031 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
10/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25031 |
|
|
05/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|