Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 986 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2060 Week
» 27421 Month
» 260341 Year
» 1925717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5184 m/e 03/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 259
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal Fri 23/10/1964
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1931
84D   Leamington 4w/e 21/02/1953
83G   Penzance m/e 16/06/1956
84D   Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1956
83B   Taunton 4w/e 14/06/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 04/10/1958
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 23/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   w/e 26/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5184
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
23/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5184    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev