Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 978 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2052 Week
» 27413 Month
» 260333 Year
» 1925709 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5192 on 11/10/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 284
To Service Mon 11/10/1934
Withdrawal Mon 24/06/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/10/1934
87G   Carmarthen 4w/e 17/07/1954
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1954
84D   Leamington 4w/e 04/11/1961
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 19/05/1962
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 19/05/1962
WDN   w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
18/08/1963 Swindon Works (Dump) Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5192
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
24/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5192    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev