Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 27 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2102 Week
» 27463 Month
» 260383 Year
» 1925759 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5194 on 12/10/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 284
To Service Tue 12/10/1934
Withdrawal Tue 18/04/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/10/1934
83B   Taunton 4w/e 12/06/1958
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 26/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 18/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1958
1STALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   m/e 30/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/05/1961 Swindon Works (Dump) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/10/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5194
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
18/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5194    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev