Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 802 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 24254 Month
» 257174 Year
» 1922550 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5195 on 22/10/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 284
To Service Tue 22/10/1934
Withdrawal Tue 13/06/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/10/1934
CVTRT     4w/e 29/12/1945
CVRHY     8w/e 23/03/1946
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 05/09/1953
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 26/12/1953
83A   Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/10/1956
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   m/e 30/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Bridgend Station The three 51XX 2-6-2T transferred in 1942 from the Birmingham area to Rhymney, Treherbert, and Ferndale are used to work special passenger trains to the Bridgend Factory. 5159/95 were at Bridgend on 17/10. SLS/194601
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('C' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111
23/07/1968 Swindon Works (Works Yard) 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5195
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1945 Allocation      
23/03/1946 Allocation      
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
13/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5195    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev