Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5202 |
28/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25052 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
by 10/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5202 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
04/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (10G) |
|
|
01/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25052 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25052 |
|
|
11/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|