Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15970 Week
» 68986 Month
» 188513 Year
» 3215366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5204 |
07/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25054 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
07/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5204 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25054 |
|
|
07/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
13/05/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25054 |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|